Senate | 04/11/2025 | Rule 2-10 Committee/3rd Reading Deadline Established As May 9, 2025 | ||
Senate | 04/09/2025 | Postponed - Higher Education | ||
Senate | 04/01/2025 | Rule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As April 11, 2025 | ||
Senate | 04/01/2025 | Re-referred to Higher Education | ||
Senate | 03/21/2025 | Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments | ||
Senate | 02/04/2025 | Assigned to Appropriations- Education | ||
Senate | 01/28/2025 | Referred to Assignments | ||
Senate | 01/28/2025 | First Reading | ||
Senate | 01/28/2025 | Filed with Secretary by Sen. Michael W. Halpin |