House
|
04/30/2025
|
Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
|
|
|
House
|
04/29/2025
|
Do Pass / Short Debate Public Utilities Committee; 017-000-000
|
|
|
House
|
04/17/2025
|
Assigned to Public Utilities Committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/09/2025
|
Referred to Rules Committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/09/2025
|
Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Kimberly A. Lightford
|
|
|
House
|
04/09/2025
|
Chief House Sponsor Rep. Harry Benton
|
|
|
House
|
04/09/2025
|
Arrived in House
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/09/2025
|
Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Laura M. Murphy
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/09/2025
|
Third Reading - Passed; 054-000-000
|
|
|
House
|
04/09/2025
|
First Reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/04/2025
|
Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading April 8, 2025
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/04/2025
|
Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Adopted; Curran
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/04/2025
|
Second Reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/04/2025
|
Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Recommend Do Adopt Energy and Public Utilities; 013-000-000
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/02/2025
|
Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Assignments Refers to Energy and Public Utilities
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/01/2025
|
Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Referred to Assignments
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/01/2025
|
Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Filed with Secretary by Sen. John F. Curran
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/21/2025
|
Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Suzy Glowiak Hilton
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/20/2025
|
Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Patrick J. Joyce
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/20/2025
|
Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading April 1, 2025
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/20/2025
|
Do Pass as Amended Energy and Public Utilities; 015-000-000
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/20/2025
|
Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/18/2025
|
Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Energy and Public Utilities
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/12/2025
|
Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/12/2025
|
Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. John F. Curran
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/04/2025
|
Assigned to Energy and Public Utilities
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/29/2025
|
Referred to Assignments
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/29/2025
|
Filed with Secretary by Sen. John F. Curran
|
|
|