Senate | 04/11/2025 | Rule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As May 9, 2025 | ||
Senate | 03/21/2025 | Rule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As April 11, 2025 | ||
Senate | 02/18/2025 | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Appropriations- Health and Human Services | ||
Senate | 02/14/2025 | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments | ||
Senate | 02/14/2025 | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Kimberly A. Lightford | ||
Senate | 02/04/2025 | Assigned to Appropriations- Health and Human Services | ||
Senate | 01/29/2025 | Referred to Assignments | ||
Senate | 01/29/2025 | First Reading | ||
Senate | 01/29/2025 | Filed with Secretary by Sen. Kimberly A. Lightford |