House
|
04/30/2025
|
Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
|
|
|
House
|
04/29/2025
|
Do Pass / Short Debate Insurance Committee; 016-000-000
|
|
|
House
|
04/17/2025
|
Assigned to Insurance Committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/15/2025
|
Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Mike Simmons
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/11/2025
|
Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/11/2025
|
Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Meg Loughran Cappel
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/11/2025
|
Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Laura M. Murphy
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/11/2025
|
Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Robert F. Martwick
|
|
|
House
|
04/09/2025
|
Referred to Rules Committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/09/2025
|
Chief House Sponsor Rep. Thaddeus Jones
|
|
|
House
|
04/09/2025
|
Arrived in House
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/09/2025
|
Third Reading - Passed; 056-000-000
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/09/2025
|
Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading
|
|
|
House
|
04/09/2025
|
First Reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/04/2025
|
Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading **
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/20/2025
|
Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading April 1, 2025
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/20/2025
|
Second Reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/19/2025
|
Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading March 20, 2025
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/19/2025
|
Do Pass as Amended Insurance; 014-000-000
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/18/2025
|
Senate Committee Amendment No. 2 Adopted
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/18/2025
|
Senate Committee Amendment No. 2 Assignments Refers to Insurance
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/12/2025
|
Senate Committee Amendment No. 2 Referred to Assignments
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/12/2025
|
Senate Committee Amendment No. 2 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Napoleon Harris, III
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/04/2025
|
Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Insurance
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/27/2025
|
Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/27/2025
|
Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Napoleon Harris, III
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/26/2025
|
Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Cristina Castro
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/20/2025
|
Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Bill Cunningham
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/18/2025
|
Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Laura Fine
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/11/2025
|
Assigned to Insurance
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/31/2025
|
Referred to Assignments
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/31/2025
|
Filed with Secretary by Sen. Napoleon Harris, III
|
|
|