House
|
04/17/2025
|
Assigned to Public Health Committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/17/2025
|
Referred to Rules Committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/17/2025
|
First Reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/11/2025
|
Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Mike Simmons
|
|
|
House
|
04/11/2025
|
Chief House Sponsor Rep. Regan Deering
|
|
|
House
|
04/11/2025
|
Arrived in House
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/11/2025
|
Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Dale Fowler
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/11/2025
|
Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Lakesia Collins
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/11/2025
|
Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Jason Plummer
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/11/2025
|
Third Reading - Passed; 053-000-000
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/09/2025
|
Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Rachel Ventura
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/02/2025
|
Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Postponed - Public Health
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/18/2025
|
Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Public Health
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/17/2025
|
Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/17/2025
|
Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Chapin Rose
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/05/2025
|
Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading March 6, 2025
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/05/2025
|
Second Reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/19/2025
|
Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Sally J. Turner
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/19/2025
|
Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading February 20, 2025
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/19/2025
|
Do Pass Public Health; 008-000-000
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/18/2025
|
Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Laura Fine
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/11/2025
|
Assigned to Public Health
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/31/2025
|
Referred to Assignments
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/31/2025
|
Filed with Secretary by Sen. Chapin Rose
|
|
|