Senate
|
04/30/2025
|
Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Julie A. Morrison
|
|
|
House
|
04/28/2025
|
House Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/28/2025
|
House Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Anna Moeller
|
|
|
House
|
04/24/2025
|
Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Mary Gill
|
|
|
House
|
04/24/2025
|
Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Mary Beth Canty
|
|
|
House
|
04/24/2025
|
Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Harry Benton
|
|
|
House
|
04/24/2025
|
Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Edgar González, Jr.
|
|
|
House
|
04/24/2025
|
Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Jennifer Gong-Gershowitz
|
|
|
House
|
04/24/2025
|
Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Bradley Fritts
|
|
|
House
|
04/24/2025
|
Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Ann M. Williams
|
|
|
House
|
04/24/2025
|
Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Dan Ugaste
|
|
|
House
|
04/24/2025
|
Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Nicolle Grasse
|
|
|
House
|
04/24/2025
|
Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Nicholas K. Smith
|
|
|
House
|
04/24/2025
|
Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Suzanne M. Ness
|
|
|
House
|
04/24/2025
|
Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Jed Davis
|
|
|
House
|
04/24/2025
|
Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Jackie Haas
|
|
|
House
|
04/24/2025
|
Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Jay Hoffman
|
|
|
House
|
04/24/2025
|
Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Nicole La Ha
|
|
|
House
|
04/24/2025
|
Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Martha Deuter
|
|
|
House
|
04/24/2025
|
Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Angelica Guerrero-Cuellar
|
|
|
House
|
04/24/2025
|
Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Hoan Huynh
|
|
|
House
|
04/24/2025
|
Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Barbara Hernandez
|
|
|
House
|
04/24/2025
|
Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Daniel Didech
|
|
|
House
|
04/24/2025
|
Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Rick Ryan
|
|
|
House
|
04/24/2025
|
Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Kelly M. Cassidy
|
|
|
House
|
04/24/2025
|
Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Bob Morgan
|
|
|
House
|
04/24/2025
|
Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Nabeela Syed
|
|
|
House
|
04/24/2025
|
Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Changed to Rep. John M. Cabello
|
|
|
House
|
04/24/2025
|
Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Changed to Rep. Dan Swanson
|
|
|
House
|
04/24/2025
|
Added Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. John M. Cabello
|
|
|
House
|
04/24/2025
|
Added Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Dan Swanson
|
|
|
House
|
04/24/2025
|
Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
|
|
|
House
|
04/24/2025
|
Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Regan Deering
|
|
|
House
|
04/24/2025
|
Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Amy Elik
|
|
|
House
|
04/24/2025
|
Do Pass / Short Debate Police & Fire Committee; 015-000-000
|
|
|
House
|
04/23/2025
|
Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Martin J. Moylan
|
|
|
House
|
04/23/2025
|
Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Brad Stephens
|
|
|
House
|
04/23/2025
|
Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Patrick Sheehan
|
|
|
House
|
04/23/2025
|
Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Katie Stuart
|
|
|
House
|
04/23/2025
|
Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Matt Hanson
|
|
|
House
|
04/23/2025
|
Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Gregg Johnson
|
|
|
House
|
04/23/2025
|
Added Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Lawrence "Larry" Walsh, Jr.
|
|
|
House
|
04/17/2025
|
Assigned to Police & Fire Committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/09/2025
|
Referred to Rules Committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/09/2025
|
Chief House Sponsor Rep. Anna Moeller
|
|
|
House
|
04/09/2025
|
Arrived in House
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/09/2025
|
Third Reading - Passed; 056-000-000
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/09/2025
|
Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading
|
|
|
House
|
04/09/2025
|
First Reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/04/2025
|
Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading **
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/19/2025
|
Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Sara Feigenholtz
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/27/2025
|
Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading March 4, 2025
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/27/2025
|
Second Reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/20/2025
|
Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading February 25, 2025
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/20/2025
|
Do Pass State Government; 008-000-000
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/11/2025
|
Assigned to State Government
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/31/2025
|
Referred to Assignments
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/31/2025
|
Filed with Secretary by Sen. Cristina Castro
|
|
|