Senate | 04/11/2025 | Rule 2-10 Committee/3rd Reading Deadline Established As May 9, 2025 | ||
Senate | 04/04/2025 | Rule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As April 11, 2025 | ||
Senate | 03/21/2025 | Rule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As April 4, 2025 | ||
Senate | 02/27/2025 | Postponed - Local Government | ||
Senate | 02/19/2025 | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Local Government | ||
Senate | 02/18/2025 | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments | ||
Senate | 02/18/2025 | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Cristina Castro | ||
Senate | 02/11/2025 | Assigned to Local Government | ||
Senate | 01/31/2025 | Referred to Assignments | ||
Senate | 01/31/2025 | First Reading | ||
Senate | 01/31/2025 | Filed with Secretary by Sen. Cristina Castro |