Senate | 04/11/2025 | Rule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As May 9, 2025 | ||
Senate | 04/08/2025 | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Meg Loughran Cappel | ||
Senate | 03/21/2025 | Rule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As April 11, 2025 | ||
Senate | 03/04/2025 | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Chris Balkema | ||
Senate | 02/27/2025 | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Chris Balkema | ||
Senate | 02/26/2025 | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Dave Syverson | ||
Senate | 02/26/2025 | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Christopher Belt | ||
Senate | 02/26/2025 | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Laura Fine | ||
Senate | 02/26/2025 | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Patrick J. Joyce | ||
Senate | 02/26/2025 | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Laura M. Murphy | ||
Senate | 02/25/2025 | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. David Koehler | ||
Senate | 02/25/2025 | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Linda Holmes | ||
Senate | 02/18/2025 | Assigned to Appropriations- Health and Human Services | ||
Senate | 01/31/2025 | Referred to Assignments | ||
Senate | 01/31/2025 | First Reading | ||
Senate | 01/31/2025 | Filed with Secretary by Sen. Julie A. Morrison |