House | 04/23/2025 | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate | ||
House | 04/23/2025 | Do Pass / Short Debate Judiciary - Civil Committee; 016-000-000 | ||
House | 04/17/2025 | Assigned to Judiciary - Civil Committee | ||
House | 04/07/2025 | Referred to Rules Committee | ||
House | 04/07/2025 | First Reading | ||
House | 04/04/2025 | Chief House Sponsor Rep. Bob Morgan | ||
House | 04/04/2025 | Arrived in House | ||
Senate | 04/03/2025 | Third Reading - Passed; 053-000-000 | ||
Senate | 03/20/2025 | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading April 1, 2025 | ||
Senate | 03/20/2025 | Second Reading | ||
Senate | 03/19/2025 | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading March 20, 2025 | ||
Senate | 03/19/2025 | Do Pass Judiciary; 009-000-000 | ||
Senate | 02/11/2025 | Assigned to Judiciary | ||
Senate | 02/07/2025 | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Michael E. Hastings | ||
Senate | 02/05/2025 | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. John F. Curran | ||
Senate | 01/31/2025 | Referred to Assignments | ||
Senate | 01/31/2025 | Filed with Secretary by Sen. Julie A. Morrison |