Senate | 04/11/2025 | Rule 2-10 Committee/3rd Reading Deadline Established As May 9, 2025 | ||
Senate | 04/03/2025 | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 To Government Operations | ||
Senate | 04/03/2025 | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Sue Rezin | ||
Senate | 03/21/2025 | Rule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As April 11, 2025 | ||
Senate | 03/20/2025 | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Adriane Johnson | ||
Senate | 03/18/2025 | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Executive | ||
Senate | 03/14/2025 | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments | ||
Senate | 03/14/2025 | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Rachel Ventura | ||
Senate | 02/19/2025 | To Government Operations | ||
Senate | 02/11/2025 | Assigned to Executive | ||
Senate | 02/04/2025 | Referred to Assignments | ||
Senate | 02/04/2025 | First Reading | ||
Senate | 02/04/2025 | Filed with Secretary by Sen. Rachel Ventura |