House
|
04/17/2025
|
Assigned to Elementary & Secondary Education: Administration, Licensing & Charter Schools
|
|
|
House
|
04/09/2025
|
Referred to Rules Committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/09/2025
|
Chief House Sponsor Rep. Laura Faver Dias
|
|
|
House
|
04/09/2025
|
Arrived in House
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/09/2025
|
Third Reading - Passed; 056-000-000
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/09/2025
|
Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading
|
|
|
House
|
04/09/2025
|
First Reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/04/2025
|
Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading **
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/04/2025
|
Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Kimberly A. Lightford
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/20/2025
|
Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading April 1, 2025
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/20/2025
|
Second Reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/05/2025
|
Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading March 6, 2025
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/05/2025
|
Do Pass as Amended Education; 013-000-000
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/04/2025
|
Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/04/2025
|
Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Education
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/03/2025
|
Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/03/2025
|
Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Sara Feigenholtz
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/26/2025
|
Postponed - Education
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/11/2025
|
Assigned to Education
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/04/2025
|
Referred to Assignments
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/04/2025
|
Filed with Secretary by Sen. Sara Feigenholtz
|
|
|