House | 04/24/2025 | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate | ||
House | 04/24/2025 | Added Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Nicolle Grasse | ||
House | 04/24/2025 | Do Pass / Short Debate Public Health Committee; 007-002-000 | ||
House | 04/17/2025 | Assigned to Public Health Committee | ||
House | 04/09/2025 | Referred to Rules Committee | ||
House | 04/09/2025 | Chief House Sponsor Rep. Stephanie A. Kifowit | ||
House | 04/09/2025 | Arrived in House | ||
Senate | 04/09/2025 | Third Reading - Passed; 045-011-000 | ||
Senate | 04/09/2025 | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading | ||
House | 04/09/2025 | First Reading | ||
Senate | 04/04/2025 | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading ** | ||
Senate | 02/27/2025 | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading March 4, 2025 | ||
Senate | 02/27/2025 | Second Reading | ||
Senate | 02/19/2025 | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading February 20, 2025 | ||
Senate | 02/19/2025 | Do Pass Public Health; 009-000-000 | ||
Senate | 02/11/2025 | Assigned to Public Health | ||
Senate | 02/04/2025 | Referred to Assignments | ||
Senate | 02/04/2025 | Filed with Secretary by Sen. Adriane Johnson |