House
|
05/01/2025
|
Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
|
|
|
House
|
04/30/2025
|
Do Pass / Short Debate State Government Administration Committee; 008-000-000
|
|
|
House
|
04/17/2025
|
Assigned to State Government Administration Committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/10/2025
|
Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Lakesia Collins
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/10/2025
|
Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Meg Loughran Cappel
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/09/2025
|
Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Kimberly A. Lightford
|
|
|
House
|
04/09/2025
|
Referred to Rules Committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/09/2025
|
Chief House Sponsor Rep. Debbie Meyers-Martin
|
|
|
House
|
04/09/2025
|
Arrived in House
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/09/2025
|
Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Laura M. Murphy
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/09/2025
|
Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Elgie R. Sims, Jr.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/09/2025
|
Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Jil Tracy
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/09/2025
|
Third Reading - Passed; 056-000-000
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/09/2025
|
Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Rachel Ventura
|
|
|
House
|
04/09/2025
|
First Reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/04/2025
|
Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/04/2025
|
Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Adopted; Koehler
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/04/2025
|
Recalled to Second Reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/03/2025
|
Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Recommend Do Adopt State Government; 008-000-000
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/03/2025
|
Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Willie Preston
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/18/2025
|
Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to State Government
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/18/2025
|
Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading March 19, 2025
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/18/2025
|
Second Reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/12/2025
|
Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/12/2025
|
Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. David Koehler
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/20/2025
|
Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading February 25, 2025
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/20/2025
|
Do Pass State Government; 008-000-000
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/11/2025
|
Assigned to State Government
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/04/2025
|
Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Doris Turner
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/04/2025
|
Referred to Assignments
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/04/2025
|
Filed with Secretary by Sen. David Koehler
|
|
|