Senate
|
04/11/2025
|
Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Javier L. Cervantes
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/08/2025
|
Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Napoleon Harris, III
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/04/2025
|
Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Mark L. Walker
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/03/2025
|
Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Steve Stadelman
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/02/2025
|
Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Dale Fowler
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/01/2025
|
Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Adriane Johnson
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/19/2025
|
Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Rachel Ventura
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/18/2025
|
Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Dave Syverson
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/10/2025
|
Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Meg Loughran Cappel
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/06/2025
|
Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Chris Balkema
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/05/2025
|
Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Suzy Glowiak Hilton
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/05/2025
|
Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Michael E. Hastings
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/27/2025
|
Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Mary Edly-Allen
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/26/2025
|
Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Michael W. Halpin
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/26/2025
|
Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Chapin Rose
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/26/2025
|
Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Andrew S. Chesney
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/25/2025
|
Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Neil Anderson
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/20/2025
|
Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Sally J. Turner
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/20/2025
|
Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Mike Porfirio
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/18/2025
|
Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Paul Faraci
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/05/2025
|
Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Doris Turner
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/05/2025
|
Referred to Assignments
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/05/2025
|
First Reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/05/2025
|
Filed with Secretary by Sen. David Koehler
|
|
|