Senate | 04/04/2025 | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Graciela Guzmán | ||
Senate | 03/21/2025 | Rule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As April 11, 2025 | ||
Senate | 03/06/2025 | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Erica Harriss | ||
Senate | 03/06/2025 | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Laura M. Murphy | ||
Senate | 03/05/2025 | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Javier L. Cervantes | ||
Senate | 03/05/2025 | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Paul Faraci | ||
Senate | 03/05/2025 | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Michael W. Halpin | ||
Senate | 03/05/2025 | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Sally J. Turner | ||
Senate | 03/05/2025 | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Neil Anderson | ||
Senate | 02/25/2025 | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Rachel Ventura | ||
Senate | 02/20/2025 | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Chris Balkema | ||
Senate | 02/18/2025 | Assigned to Appropriations | ||
Senate | 02/05/2025 | Referred to Assignments | ||
Senate | 02/05/2025 | First Reading | ||
Senate | 02/05/2025 | Filed with Secretary by Sen. David Koehler |