House
|
05/01/2025
|
Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Jaime M. Andrade, Jr.
|
|
|
House
|
04/30/2025
|
Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Joyce Mason
|
|
|
House
|
04/30/2025
|
Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
|
|
|
House
|
04/29/2025
|
Do Pass / Short Debate Energy & Environment Committee; 017-010-000
|
|
|
House
|
04/17/2025
|
Assigned to Energy & Environment Committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/11/2025
|
Referred to Rules Committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/11/2025
|
First Reading
|
|
|
House
|
04/10/2025
|
Chief House Sponsor Rep. Will Guzzardi
|
|
|
House
|
04/10/2025
|
Arrived in House
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/10/2025
|
Third Reading - Passed; 040-015-000
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/10/2025
|
Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/10/2025
|
Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Adopted; Guzman
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/10/2025
|
Recalled to Second Reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/10/2025
|
Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Recommend Do Adopt Environment and Conservation; 007-003-000
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/09/2025
|
Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Mike Simmons
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/08/2025
|
Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Assignments Refers to Environment and Conservation
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/04/2025
|
Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Referred to Assignments
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/04/2025
|
Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Graciela Guzmán
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/02/2025
|
Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Adriane Johnson
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/02/2025
|
Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading April 3, 2025
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/02/2025
|
Second Reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/20/2025
|
Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading April 1, 2025
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/20/2025
|
Do Pass as Amended Environment and Conservation; 007-002-000
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/20/2025
|
Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/20/2025
|
Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Laura Fine
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/20/2025
|
Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Karina Villa
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/18/2025
|
Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Environment and Conservation
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/14/2025
|
Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/14/2025
|
Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Graciela Guzmán
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/12/2025
|
Assigned to Environment and Conservation
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/25/2025
|
Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Rachel Ventura
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/06/2025
|
Referred to Assignments
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/06/2025
|
Filed with Secretary by Sen. Graciela Guzmán
|
|
|