Senate | 04/11/2025 | Rule 2-10 Third Reading Deadline Established As May 9, 2025 | ||
Senate | 04/11/2025 | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading April 29, 2025 | ||
Senate | 04/11/2025 | Second Reading | ||
Senate | 04/09/2025 | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading April 10, 2025 | ||
Senate | 04/09/2025 | Do Pass Executive; 009-004-000 | ||
Senate | 04/04/2025 | Rule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As April 11, 2025 | ||
Senate | 03/21/2025 | Rule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As April 4, 2025 | ||
Senate | 03/12/2025 | Assigned to Executive | ||
Senate | 02/06/2025 | Referred to Assignments | ||
Senate | 02/06/2025 | First Reading | ||
Senate | 02/06/2025 | Filed with Secretary by Sen. Cristina Castro |