Senate | 03/20/2025 | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Donald P. DeWitte | ||
Senate | 03/18/2025 | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Jason Plummer | ||
Senate | 03/17/2025 | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Sally J. Turner | ||
Senate | 03/14/2025 | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Terri Bryant | ||
Senate | 02/06/2025 | Referred to Assignments | ||
Senate | 02/06/2025 | First Reading | ||
Senate | 02/06/2025 | Filed with Secretary by Sen. Erica Harriss |