House
|
04/29/2025
|
House Floor Amendment No. 3 Recommends Be Adopted Rules Committee; 005-000-000
|
|
|
House
|
04/28/2025
|
Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Bob Morgan
|
|
|
House
|
04/25/2025
|
Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Barbara Hernandez
|
|
|
House
|
04/25/2025
|
Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Katie Stuart
|
|
|
House
|
04/25/2025
|
Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Jeff Keicher
|
|
|
House
|
04/25/2025
|
Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Jennifer Sanalitro
|
|
|
House
|
04/24/2025
|
Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Michael J. Kelly
|
|
|
House
|
04/24/2025
|
Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Harry Benton
|
|
|
House
|
04/24/2025
|
Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Angelica Guerrero-Cuellar
|
|
|
House
|
04/24/2025
|
Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Martin J. Moylan
|
|
|
House
|
04/24/2025
|
Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. William "Will" Davis
|
|
|
House
|
04/24/2025
|
Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Regan Deering
|
|
|
House
|
04/24/2025
|
House Floor Amendment No. 3 Referred to Rules Committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/24/2025
|
House Floor Amendment No. 3 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Jaime M. Andrade, Jr.
|
|
|
House
|
04/23/2025
|
Added Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Wayne A. Rosenthal
|
|
|
House
|
04/23/2025
|
Added Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Brad Stephens
|
|
|
House
|
04/23/2025
|
Added Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Jay Hoffman
|
|
|
House
|
04/23/2025
|
Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
|
|
|
House
|
04/23/2025
|
Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Gregg Johnson
|
|
|
House
|
04/23/2025
|
House Committee Amendment No. 2 Tabled
|
|
|
House
|
04/23/2025
|
Do Pass as Amended / Short Debate Transportation: Vehicles & Safety; 012-000-000
|
|
|
House
|
04/23/2025
|
House Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted in Transportation: Vehicles & Safety; by Voice Vote
|
|
|
House
|
04/23/2025
|
House Committee Amendment No. 2 Referred to Rules Committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/23/2025
|
House Committee Amendment No. 2 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Jaime M. Andrade, Jr.
|
|
|
House
|
04/22/2025
|
House Committee Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Transportation: Vehicles & Safety
|
|
|
House
|
04/21/2025
|
House Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/21/2025
|
House Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Jaime M. Andrade, Jr.
|
|
|
House
|
04/17/2025
|
Assigned to Transportation: Vehicles & Safety
|
|
|
House
|
04/11/2025
|
Referred to Rules Committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/11/2025
|
First Reading
|
|
|
House
|
04/10/2025
|
Chief House Sponsor Rep. Jaime M. Andrade, Jr.
|
|
|
House
|
04/10/2025
|
Arrived in House
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/10/2025
|
Third Reading - Passed; 052-002-000
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/10/2025
|
Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/10/2025
|
Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Adopted; Porfirio
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/10/2025
|
Recalled to Second Reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/10/2025
|
Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Patrick J. Joyce
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/10/2025
|
Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Meg Loughran Cappel
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/09/2025
|
Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Recommend Do Adopt State Government; 008-000-000
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/09/2025
|
Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Assignments Refers to State Government
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/09/2025
|
Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Referred to Assignments
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/09/2025
|
Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Mike Porfirio
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/09/2025
|
Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Jil Tracy
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/03/2025
|
Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. John F. Curran
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/02/2025
|
Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading April 3, 2025
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/02/2025
|
Second Reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/20/2025
|
Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Neil Anderson
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/20/2025
|
Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Sue Rezin
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/20/2025
|
Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Napoleon Harris, III
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/20/2025
|
Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Sara Feigenholtz
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/19/2025
|
Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading March 20, 2025
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/19/2025
|
Do Pass as Amended State Government; 009-000-000
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/19/2025
|
Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/18/2025
|
Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to State Government
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/12/2025
|
Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/12/2025
|
Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Mike Porfirio
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/12/2025
|
Assigned to State Government
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/07/2025
|
Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Cristina Castro
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/07/2025
|
Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Donald P. DeWitte
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/06/2025
|
Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Christopher Belt
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/21/2025
|
Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Ram Villivalam
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/20/2025
|
Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Seth Lewis
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/20/2025
|
Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Michael E. Hastings
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/19/2025
|
Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Linda Holmes
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/19/2025
|
Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. David Koehler
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/19/2025
|
Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Sally J. Turner
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/07/2025
|
Referred to Assignments
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/07/2025
|
Filed with Secretary by Sen. Mike Porfirio
|
|
|