House
|
04/25/2025
|
Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Will Guzzardi
|
|
|
House
|
04/24/2025
|
Added Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Kevin John Olickal
|
|
|
House
|
04/23/2025
|
Added Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Justin Slaughter
|
|
|
House
|
04/17/2025
|
Assigned to Judiciary - Criminal Committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/09/2025
|
Referred to Rules Committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/09/2025
|
Chief House Sponsor Rep. Hoan Huynh
|
|
|
House
|
04/09/2025
|
Arrived in House
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/09/2025
|
Third Reading - Passed; 035-017-000
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/09/2025
|
Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/09/2025
|
Senate Floor Amendment No. 3 Adopted; Ventura
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/09/2025
|
Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Tabled Pursuant to Rule 5-4(a)
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/09/2025
|
Recalled to Second Reading
|
|
|
House
|
04/09/2025
|
First Reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/08/2025
|
Senate Floor Amendment No. 3 Recommend Do Adopt Criminal Law; 007-001-000
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/08/2025
|
Senate Floor Amendment No. 3 Assignments Refers to Criminal Law
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/03/2025
|
Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Linda Holmes
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/02/2025
|
Senate Floor Amendment No. 3 Referred to Assignments
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/02/2025
|
Senate Floor Amendment No. 3 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Rachel Ventura
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/01/2025
|
Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Assignments Refers to Criminal Law
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/26/2025
|
Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Referred to Assignments
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/26/2025
|
Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Rachel Ventura
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/21/2025
|
Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Graciela Guzmán
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/21/2025
|
Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Doris Turner
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/20/2025
|
Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Adriane Johnson
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/20/2025
|
Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading April 1, 2025
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/20/2025
|
Second Reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/19/2025
|
Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading March 20, 2025
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/19/2025
|
Do Pass as Amended Criminal Law; 006-002-000
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/18/2025
|
Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/18/2025
|
Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Criminal Law
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/14/2025
|
Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/14/2025
|
Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Rachel Ventura
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/25/2025
|
Assigned to Criminal Law
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/07/2025
|
Referred to Assignments
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/07/2025
|
Filed with Secretary by Sen. Rachel Ventura
|
|
|