House | 04/24/2025 | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate | ||
House | 04/23/2025 | Do Pass / Short Debate Labor & Commerce Committee; 017-008-000 | ||
House | 04/17/2025 | Assigned to Labor & Commerce Committee | ||
House | 04/09/2025 | Referred to Rules Committee | ||
House | 04/09/2025 | Chief House Sponsor Rep. Eva-Dina Delgado | ||
House | 04/09/2025 | Arrived in House | ||
Senate | 04/09/2025 | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Lakesia Collins | ||
Senate | 04/09/2025 | Third Reading - Passed; 037-019-000 | ||
House | 04/09/2025 | First Reading | ||
Senate | 04/02/2025 | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Graciela Guzmán | ||
Senate | 03/19/2025 | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading March 20, 2025 | ||
Senate | 03/19/2025 | Second Reading | ||
Senate | 03/05/2025 | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading March 6, 2025 | ||
Senate | 03/05/2025 | Do Pass Labor; 015-003-000 | ||
Senate | 02/28/2025 | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Javier L. Cervantes | ||
Senate | 02/25/2025 | Assigned to Labor | ||
Senate | 02/07/2025 | Referred to Assignments | ||
Senate | 02/07/2025 | Filed with Secretary by Sen. Michael W. Halpin |