House | 04/24/2025 | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate | ||
House | 04/24/2025 | Do Pass / Short Debate Personnel & Pensions Committee; 012-000-000 | ||
House | 04/17/2025 | Assigned to Personnel & Pensions Committee | ||
House | 04/10/2025 | Referred to Rules Committee | ||
House | 04/10/2025 | Chief House Sponsor Rep. Stephanie A. Kifowit | ||
House | 04/10/2025 | First Reading | ||
House | 04/04/2025 | Arrived in House | ||
Senate | 04/03/2025 | Third Reading - Passed; 055-000-000 | ||
Senate | 03/19/2025 | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading March 20, 2025 | ||
Senate | 03/19/2025 | Second Reading | ||
Senate | 03/05/2025 | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Javier L. Cervantes | ||
Senate | 03/05/2025 | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading March 6, 2025 | ||
Senate | 03/05/2025 | Do Pass Labor; 018-000-000 | ||
Senate | 02/25/2025 | Assigned to Labor | ||
Senate | 02/07/2025 | Referred to Assignments | ||
Senate | 02/07/2025 | Filed with Secretary by Sen. Mike Porfirio |