Senate
|
05/02/2025
|
Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Sara Feigenholtz
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/11/2025
|
Senate Committee Amendment No. 2 Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/11/2025
|
Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/11/2025
|
Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/11/2025
|
Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Javier L. Cervantes
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/11/2025
|
Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Cristina Castro
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/09/2025
|
Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. David Koehler
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/09/2025
|
Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Laura M. Murphy
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/09/2025
|
Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Mary Edly-Allen
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/08/2025
|
Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Doris Turner
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/08/2025
|
Senate Committee Amendment No. 2 Assignments Refers to Executive
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/04/2025
|
Senate Committee Amendment No. 2 Referred to Assignments
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/04/2025
|
Senate Committee Amendment No. 2 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Willie Preston
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/03/2025
|
Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 To Procurement
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/21/2025
|
Rule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As April 11, 2025
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/19/2025
|
To Procurement
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/18/2025
|
Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Executive
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/14/2025
|
Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/14/2025
|
Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Willie Preston
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/04/2025
|
Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Graciela Guzmán
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/04/2025
|
Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Rachel Ventura
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/26/2025
|
Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Karina Villa
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/25/2025
|
Assigned to Executive
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/24/2025
|
Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Adriane Johnson
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/19/2025
|
Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Mike Porfirio
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/07/2025
|
Referred to Assignments
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/07/2025
|
First Reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/07/2025
|
Filed with Secretary by Sen. Willie Preston
|
|
|