1 | 1 | | 104TH GENERAL ASSEMBLY
State of Illinois
2025 and 2026 SB2190 Introduced 2/7/2025, by Sen. Lakesia Collins SYNOPSIS AS INTRODUCED: 305 ILCS 5/5-5e.1 Amends the Medical Assistance Article of the Illinois Public Aid Code. Requires the Department of Healthcare and Family Services to create an add-on payment for safety-net hospitals with a Level 1 Trauma designation, equal to at least $35,000,000 per hospital, per year. LRB104 11279 KTG 21365 b A BILL FOR 104TH GENERAL ASSEMBLY
State of Illinois
2025 and 2026 SB2190 Introduced 2/7/2025, by Sen. Lakesia Collins SYNOPSIS AS INTRODUCED: 305 ILCS 5/5-5e.1 305 ILCS 5/5-5e.1 Amends the Medical Assistance Article of the Illinois Public Aid Code. Requires the Department of Healthcare and Family Services to create an add-on payment for safety-net hospitals with a Level 1 Trauma designation, equal to at least $35,000,000 per hospital, per year. LRB104 11279 KTG 21365 b LRB104 11279 KTG 21365 b A BILL FOR |
---|
2 | 2 | | 104TH GENERAL ASSEMBLY
State of Illinois
2025 and 2026 SB2190 Introduced 2/7/2025, by Sen. Lakesia Collins SYNOPSIS AS INTRODUCED: |
---|
3 | 3 | | 305 ILCS 5/5-5e.1 305 ILCS 5/5-5e.1 |
---|
4 | 4 | | 305 ILCS 5/5-5e.1 |
---|
5 | 5 | | Amends the Medical Assistance Article of the Illinois Public Aid Code. Requires the Department of Healthcare and Family Services to create an add-on payment for safety-net hospitals with a Level 1 Trauma designation, equal to at least $35,000,000 per hospital, per year. |
---|
6 | 6 | | LRB104 11279 KTG 21365 b LRB104 11279 KTG 21365 b |
---|
7 | 7 | | LRB104 11279 KTG 21365 b |
---|
8 | 8 | | A BILL FOR |
---|
9 | 9 | | SB2190LRB104 11279 KTG 21365 b SB2190 LRB104 11279 KTG 21365 b |
---|
10 | 10 | | SB2190 LRB104 11279 KTG 21365 b |
---|
11 | 11 | | 1 AN ACT concerning public aid. |
---|
12 | 12 | | 2 Be it enacted by the People of the State of Illinois, |
---|
13 | 13 | | 3 represented in the General Assembly: |
---|
14 | 14 | | 4 Section 5. The Illinois Public Aid Code is amended by |
---|
15 | 15 | | 5 changing Section 5-5e.1 as follows: |
---|
16 | 16 | | 6 (305 ILCS 5/5-5e.1) |
---|
17 | 17 | | 7 Sec. 5-5e.1. Safety-Net Hospitals. |
---|
18 | 18 | | 8 (a) A Safety-Net Hospital is an Illinois hospital that: |
---|
19 | 19 | | 9 (1) is licensed by the Department of Public Health as |
---|
20 | 20 | | 10 a general acute care or pediatric hospital; and |
---|
21 | 21 | | 11 (2) is a disproportionate share hospital, as described |
---|
22 | 22 | | 12 in Section 1923 of the federal Social Security Act, as |
---|
23 | 23 | | 13 determined by the Department; and |
---|
24 | 24 | | 14 (3) meets one of the following: |
---|
25 | 25 | | 15 (A) has a MIUR of at least 40% and a charity |
---|
26 | 26 | | 16 percent of at least 4%; or |
---|
27 | 27 | | 17 (B) has a MIUR of at least 50%. |
---|
28 | 28 | | 18 (b) Definitions. As used in this Section: |
---|
29 | 29 | | 19 (1) "Charity percent" means the ratio of (i) the |
---|
30 | 30 | | 20 hospital's charity charges for services provided to |
---|
31 | 31 | | 21 individuals without health insurance or another source of |
---|
32 | 32 | | 22 third party coverage to (ii) the Illinois total hospital |
---|
33 | 33 | | 23 charges, each as reported on the hospital's OBRA form. |
---|
34 | 34 | | |
---|
35 | 35 | | |
---|
36 | 36 | | |
---|
37 | 37 | | 104TH GENERAL ASSEMBLY
State of Illinois
2025 and 2026 SB2190 Introduced 2/7/2025, by Sen. Lakesia Collins SYNOPSIS AS INTRODUCED: |
---|
38 | 38 | | 305 ILCS 5/5-5e.1 305 ILCS 5/5-5e.1 |
---|
39 | 39 | | 305 ILCS 5/5-5e.1 |
---|
40 | 40 | | Amends the Medical Assistance Article of the Illinois Public Aid Code. Requires the Department of Healthcare and Family Services to create an add-on payment for safety-net hospitals with a Level 1 Trauma designation, equal to at least $35,000,000 per hospital, per year. |
---|
41 | 41 | | LRB104 11279 KTG 21365 b LRB104 11279 KTG 21365 b |
---|
42 | 42 | | LRB104 11279 KTG 21365 b |
---|
43 | 43 | | A BILL FOR |
---|
44 | 44 | | |
---|
45 | 45 | | |
---|
46 | 46 | | |
---|
47 | 47 | | |
---|
48 | 48 | | |
---|
49 | 49 | | 305 ILCS 5/5-5e.1 |
---|
50 | 50 | | |
---|
51 | 51 | | |
---|
52 | 52 | | |
---|
53 | 53 | | LRB104 11279 KTG 21365 b |
---|
54 | 54 | | |
---|
55 | 55 | | |
---|
56 | 56 | | |
---|
57 | 57 | | |
---|
58 | 58 | | |
---|
59 | 59 | | |
---|
60 | 60 | | |
---|
61 | 61 | | |
---|
62 | 62 | | |
---|
63 | 63 | | SB2190 LRB104 11279 KTG 21365 b |
---|
64 | 64 | | |
---|
65 | 65 | | |
---|
66 | 66 | | SB2190- 2 -LRB104 11279 KTG 21365 b SB2190 - 2 - LRB104 11279 KTG 21365 b |
---|
67 | 67 | | SB2190 - 2 - LRB104 11279 KTG 21365 b |
---|
68 | 68 | | 1 (2) "MIUR" means Medicaid Inpatient Utilization Rate |
---|
69 | 69 | | 2 and is defined as a fraction, the numerator of which is the |
---|
70 | 70 | | 3 number of a hospital's inpatient days provided in the |
---|
71 | 71 | | 4 hospital's fiscal year ending 3 years prior to the rate |
---|
72 | 72 | | 5 year, to patients who, for such days, were eligible for |
---|
73 | 73 | | 6 Medicaid under Title XIX of the federal Social Security |
---|
74 | 74 | | 7 Act, 42 USC 1396a et seq., excluding those persons |
---|
75 | 75 | | 8 eligible for medical assistance pursuant to 42 U.S.C. |
---|
76 | 76 | | 9 1396a(a)(10)(A)(i)(VIII) as set forth in paragraph 18 of |
---|
77 | 77 | | 10 Section 5-2 of this Article, and the denominator of which |
---|
78 | 78 | | 11 is the total number of the hospital's inpatient days in |
---|
79 | 79 | | 12 that same period, excluding those persons eligible for |
---|
80 | 80 | | 13 medical assistance pursuant to 42 U.S.C. |
---|
81 | 81 | | 14 1396a(a)(10)(A)(i)(VIII) as set forth in paragraph 18 of |
---|
82 | 82 | | 15 Section 5-2 of this Article. |
---|
83 | 83 | | 16 (3) "OBRA form" means form HFS-3834, OBRA '93 data |
---|
84 | 84 | | 17 collection form, for the rate year. |
---|
85 | 85 | | 18 (4) "Rate year" means the 12-month period beginning on |
---|
86 | 86 | | 19 October 1. |
---|
87 | 87 | | 20 (c) Beginning July 1, 2012 and ending on December 31, |
---|
88 | 88 | | 21 2026, a hospital that would have qualified for the rate year |
---|
89 | 89 | | 22 beginning October 1, 2011 or October 1, 2012 shall be a |
---|
90 | 90 | | 23 Safety-Net Hospital. |
---|
91 | 91 | | 24 (c-5) Beginning July 1, 2020 and ending on December 31, |
---|
92 | 92 | | 25 2026, a hospital that would have qualified for the rate year |
---|
93 | 93 | | 26 beginning October 1, 2020 and was designated a federal rural |
---|
94 | 94 | | |
---|
95 | 95 | | |
---|
96 | 96 | | |
---|
97 | 97 | | |
---|
98 | 98 | | |
---|
99 | 99 | | SB2190 - 2 - LRB104 11279 KTG 21365 b |
---|
100 | 100 | | |
---|
101 | 101 | | |
---|
102 | 102 | | SB2190- 3 -LRB104 11279 KTG 21365 b SB2190 - 3 - LRB104 11279 KTG 21365 b |
---|
103 | 103 | | SB2190 - 3 - LRB104 11279 KTG 21365 b |
---|
104 | 104 | | |
---|
105 | 105 | | |
---|
106 | 106 | | |
---|
107 | 107 | | |
---|
108 | 108 | | |
---|
109 | 109 | | SB2190 - 3 - LRB104 11279 KTG 21365 b |
---|