Senate | 04/11/2025 | Rule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As May 9, 2025 | ||
Senate | 04/10/2025 | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Steve McClure | ||
Senate | 03/28/2025 | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Terri Bryant | ||
Senate | 03/26/2025 | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Chapin Rose | ||
Senate | 03/25/2025 | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Patrick J. Joyce | ||
Senate | 03/21/2025 | Rule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As April 11, 2025 | ||
Senate | 03/21/2025 | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Jil Tracy | ||
Senate | 03/20/2025 | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Neil Anderson | ||
Senate | 02/25/2025 | Assigned to Appropriations | ||
Senate | 02/13/2025 | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. David Koehler | ||
Senate | 02/07/2025 | Referred to Assignments | ||
Senate | 02/07/2025 | First Reading | ||
Senate | 02/07/2025 | Filed with Secretary by Sen. Sally J. Turner |