Senate | 04/10/2025 | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Kimberly A. Lightford | ||
Senate | 04/02/2025 | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Adriane Johnson | ||
Senate | 04/02/2025 | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Willie Preston | ||
Senate | 03/05/2025 | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Mike Simmons | ||
Senate | 03/03/2025 | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Graciela Guzmán | ||
Senate | 02/27/2025 | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Mike Porfirio | ||
Senate | 02/26/2025 | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Karina Villa | ||
Senate | 02/26/2025 | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Javier L. Cervantes | ||
Senate | 02/07/2025 | Referred to Assignments | ||
Senate | 02/07/2025 | First Reading | ||
Senate | 02/07/2025 | Filed with Secretary by Sen. Lakesia Collins |