Senate | 03/20/2025 | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Ram Villivalam | ||
Senate | 02/26/2025 | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Rachel Ventura | ||
Senate | 02/25/2025 | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Graciela Guzmán | ||
Senate | 02/20/2025 | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Mary Edly-Allen | ||
Senate | 02/11/2025 | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Adriane Johnson | ||
Senate | 02/07/2025 | Referred to Assignments | ||
Senate | 02/07/2025 | First Reading | ||
Senate | 02/07/2025 | Filed with Secretary by Sen. Omar Aquino |