Senate | 04/11/2025 | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Cristina Castro | ||
Senate | 04/10/2025 | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Mattie Hunter | ||
Senate | 04/09/2025 | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Laura M. Murphy | ||
Senate | 04/09/2025 | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Mary Edly-Allen | ||
Senate | 04/08/2025 | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Paul Faraci | ||
Senate | 04/02/2025 | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Dale Fowler | ||
Senate | 03/21/2025 | Rule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As April 11, 2025 | ||
Senate | 03/04/2025 | Assigned to Appropriations | ||
Senate | 02/07/2025 | Referred to Assignments | ||
Senate | 02/07/2025 | First Reading | ||
Senate | 02/07/2025 | Filed with Secretary by Sen. David Koehler |