House | 04/17/2025 | Assigned to Agriculture & Conservation Committee | ||
House | 04/09/2025 | Referred to Rules Committee | ||
House | 04/09/2025 | Chief House Sponsor Rep. Katie Stuart | ||
House | 04/09/2025 | Arrived in House | ||
Senate | 04/09/2025 | Third Reading - Passed; 054-002-000 | ||
Senate | 04/09/2025 | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading | ||
House | 04/09/2025 | First Reading | ||
Senate | 04/04/2025 | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading ** | ||
Senate | 04/03/2025 | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading April 4, 2025 | ||
Senate | 04/03/2025 | Second Reading | ||
Senate | 04/02/2025 | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Patrick J. Joyce | ||
Senate | 03/20/2025 | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading April 1, 2025 | ||
Senate | 03/20/2025 | Do Pass Agriculture; 013-000-000 | ||
Senate | 03/04/2025 | Assigned to Agriculture | ||
Senate | 02/07/2025 | Referred to Assignments | ||
Senate | 02/07/2025 | Filed with Secretary by Sen. Michael W. Halpin |