House
|
04/30/2025
|
Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
|
|
|
House
|
04/30/2025
|
Do Pass / Short Debate Judiciary - Civil Committee; 020-000-000
|
|
|
House
|
04/17/2025
|
Assigned to Judiciary - Civil Committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/11/2025
|
Referred to Rules Committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/11/2025
|
First Reading
|
|
|
House
|
04/10/2025
|
Chief House Sponsor Rep. Terra Costa Howard
|
|
|
House
|
04/10/2025
|
Arrived in House
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/10/2025
|
Third Reading - Passed; 055-000-000
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/10/2025
|
Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/10/2025
|
Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Adopted; E. Harriss
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/10/2025
|
Recalled to Second Reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/09/2025
|
Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Recommend Do Adopt Judiciary; 008-000-000
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/08/2025
|
Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Judiciary
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/04/2025
|
Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/04/2025
|
Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Erica Harriss
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/20/2025
|
Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading April 1, 2025
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/20/2025
|
Second Reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/19/2025
|
Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading March 20, 2025
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/19/2025
|
Do Pass Judiciary; 009-000-000
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/04/2025
|
Assigned to Judiciary
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/07/2025
|
Referred to Assignments
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/07/2025
|
Filed with Secretary by Sen. Erica Harriss
|
|
|