Senate | 04/11/2025 | Rule 2-10 Committee/3rd Reading Deadline Established As May 9, 2025 | ||
Senate | 04/08/2025 | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Licensed Activities | ||
Senate | 04/04/2025 | Rule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As April 11, 2025 | ||
Senate | 04/02/2025 | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments | ||
Senate | 04/02/2025 | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Michael E. Hastings | ||
Senate | 03/21/2025 | Rule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As April 4, 2025 | ||
Senate | 03/20/2025 | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Paul Faraci | ||
Senate | 03/18/2025 | Assigned to Licensed Activities | ||
Senate | 02/07/2025 | Referred to Assignments | ||
Senate | 02/07/2025 | First Reading | ||
Senate | 02/07/2025 | Filed with Secretary by Sen. Michael E. Hastings |