104TH GENERAL ASSEMBLY State of Illinois 2025 and 2026 SB2469 Introduced 2/7/2025, by Sen. Michael E. Hastings SYNOPSIS AS INTRODUCED: 720 ILCS 570/311.6 Amends the Illinois Controlled Substances Act. Provides that, notwithstanding any other provision of law, a prescriber shall not be required to issue prescriptions for a substance classified in Schedule II, III, IV, or V electronically if the prescription is issued by a licensed veterinarian within 7 (rather than 2) years after November 17, 2023 (the effective date of Public Act 103-563). LRB104 08825 RLC 18880 b A BILL FOR 104TH GENERAL ASSEMBLY State of Illinois 2025 and 2026 SB2469 Introduced 2/7/2025, by Sen. Michael E. Hastings SYNOPSIS AS INTRODUCED: 720 ILCS 570/311.6 720 ILCS 570/311.6 Amends the Illinois Controlled Substances Act. Provides that, notwithstanding any other provision of law, a prescriber shall not be required to issue prescriptions for a substance classified in Schedule II, III, IV, or V electronically if the prescription is issued by a licensed veterinarian within 7 (rather than 2) years after November 17, 2023 (the effective date of Public Act 103-563). LRB104 08825 RLC 18880 b LRB104 08825 RLC 18880 b A BILL FOR 104TH GENERAL ASSEMBLY State of Illinois 2025 and 2026 SB2469 Introduced 2/7/2025, by Sen. Michael E. Hastings SYNOPSIS AS INTRODUCED: 720 ILCS 570/311.6 720 ILCS 570/311.6 720 ILCS 570/311.6 Amends the Illinois Controlled Substances Act. Provides that, notwithstanding any other provision of law, a prescriber shall not be required to issue prescriptions for a substance classified in Schedule II, III, IV, or V electronically if the prescription is issued by a licensed veterinarian within 7 (rather than 2) years after November 17, 2023 (the effective date of Public Act 103-563). LRB104 08825 RLC 18880 b LRB104 08825 RLC 18880 b LRB104 08825 RLC 18880 b A BILL FOR SB2469LRB104 08825 RLC 18880 b SB2469 LRB104 08825 RLC 18880 b SB2469 LRB104 08825 RLC 18880 b 1 AN ACT concerning criminal law. 2 Be it enacted by the People of the State of Illinois, 3 represented in the General Assembly: 4 Section 5. The Illinois Controlled Substances Act is 5 amended by changing Section 311.6 as follows: 6 (720 ILCS 570/311.6) 7 Sec. 311.6. Prescriptions for substance classified in 8 Schedule II, III, IV, or V sent electronically; exceptions 9 Opioid prescriptions. 10 (a) Notwithstanding any other provision of law, a 11 prescription for a substance classified in Schedule II, III, 12 IV, or V must be sent electronically, in accordance with 13 Section 316. Prescriptions sent in accordance with this 14 subsection (a) must be accepted by the dispenser in electronic 15 format. 16 (b) Beginning on January 1, 2024 (the effective date of 17 Public Act 103-425) this amendatory Act of the 103rd General 18 Assembly until December 31, 2028, notwithstanding any other 19 provision of this Section or any other provision of law, a 20 prescriber shall not be required to issue prescriptions 21 electronically if he or she certifies to the Department of 22 Financial and Professional Regulation that he or she will not 23 issue more than 150 prescriptions during a 12-month period. 104TH GENERAL ASSEMBLY State of Illinois 2025 and 2026 SB2469 Introduced 2/7/2025, by Sen. Michael E. Hastings SYNOPSIS AS INTRODUCED: 720 ILCS 570/311.6 720 ILCS 570/311.6 720 ILCS 570/311.6 Amends the Illinois Controlled Substances Act. Provides that, notwithstanding any other provision of law, a prescriber shall not be required to issue prescriptions for a substance classified in Schedule II, III, IV, or V electronically if the prescription is issued by a licensed veterinarian within 7 (rather than 2) years after November 17, 2023 (the effective date of Public Act 103-563). LRB104 08825 RLC 18880 b LRB104 08825 RLC 18880 b LRB104 08825 RLC 18880 b A BILL FOR 720 ILCS 570/311.6 LRB104 08825 RLC 18880 b SB2469 LRB104 08825 RLC 18880 b SB2469- 2 -LRB104 08825 RLC 18880 b SB2469 - 2 - LRB104 08825 RLC 18880 b SB2469 - 2 - LRB104 08825 RLC 18880 b 1 Prescriptions in both oral and written form for controlled 2 substances shall be included in determining whether the 3 prescriber will reach the limit of 150 prescriptions. 4 Beginning January 1, 2029, notwithstanding any other provision 5 of this Section or any other provision of law, a prescriber 6 shall not be required to issue prescriptions electronically if 7 he or she certifies to the Department of Financial and 8 Professional Regulation that he or she will not issue more 9 than 50 prescriptions during a 12-month period. Prescriptions 10 in both oral and written form for controlled substances shall 11 be included in determining whether the prescriber will reach 12 the limit of 50 prescriptions. 13 (b-5) Notwithstanding any other provision of this Section 14 or any other provision of law, a prescriber shall not be 15 required to issue prescriptions electronically under the 16 following circumstances: 17 (1) prior to January 1, 2026, the prescriber 18 demonstrates financial difficulties in buying or managing 19 an electronic prescription option, whether it is an 20 electronic health record or some other electronic 21 prescribing product; 22 (2) on and after January 1, 2026, the prescriber 23 provides proof of a waiver from the Centers for Medicare 24 and Medicaid Services for the Electronic Prescribing for 25 Controlled Substances Program due to demonstrated economic 26 hardship for the previous compliance year; SB2469 - 2 - LRB104 08825 RLC 18880 b SB2469- 3 -LRB104 08825 RLC 18880 b SB2469 - 3 - LRB104 08825 RLC 18880 b SB2469 - 3 - LRB104 08825 RLC 18880 b 1 (3) there is a temporary technological or electrical 2 failure that prevents an electronic prescription from 3 being issued; 4 (4) the prescription is for a drug that the 5 practitioner reasonably determines would be impractical 6 for the patient to obtain in a timely manner if prescribed 7 by an electronic data transmission prescription and the 8 delay would adversely impact the patient's medical 9 condition; 10 (5) the prescription is for an individual who: 11 (A) resides in a nursing or assisted living 12 facility; 13 (B) is receiving hospice or palliative care; 14 (C) is receiving care at an outpatient renal 15 dialysis facility and the prescription is related to 16 the care provided; 17 (D) is receiving care through the United States 18 Department of Veterans Affairs; or 19 (E) is incarcerated in a state, detained, or 20 confined in a correctional facility; 21 (6) the prescription prescribes a drug under a 22 research protocol; 23 (7) the prescription is a non-patient specific 24 prescription dispensed under a standing order, approved 25 protocol for drug therapy, collaborative drug management, 26 or comprehensive medication management, or in response to SB2469 - 3 - LRB104 08825 RLC 18880 b SB2469- 4 -LRB104 08825 RLC 18880 b SB2469 - 4 - LRB104 08825 RLC 18880 b SB2469 - 4 - LRB104 08825 RLC 18880 b 1 a public health emergency or other circumstance in which 2 the practitioner may issue a non-patient specific 3 prescription; 4 (8) the prescription is issued when the prescriber and 5 dispenser are the same entity; 6 (9) the prescription is issued for a compound 7 prescription containing 2 or more compounds; or 8 (10) the prescription is issued by a licensed 9 veterinarian within 7 2 years after November 17, 2023 ( 10 the effective date of Public Act 103-563) this amendatory 11 Act of the 103rd General Assembly. 12 (c) The Department of Financial and Professional 13 Regulation may adopt rules for the administration of this 14 Section to the requirements under this Section that the 15 Department of Financial and Professional Regulation may deem 16 appropriate. 17 (d) Any prescriber who makes a good faith effort to 18 prescribe electronically, but for reasons not within the 19 prescriber's control is unable to prescribe electronically, 20 may be exempt from any disciplinary action. 21 (e) Any pharmacist who dispenses in good faith based upon 22 a valid prescription that is not prescribed electronically may 23 be exempt from any disciplinary action. A pharmacist is not 24 required to ensure or responsible for ensuring the 25 prescriber's compliance under subsection (b), nor may any 26 other entity or organization require a pharmacist to ensure SB2469 - 4 - LRB104 08825 RLC 18880 b SB2469- 5 -LRB104 08825 RLC 18880 b SB2469 - 5 - LRB104 08825 RLC 18880 b SB2469 - 5 - LRB104 08825 RLC 18880 b SB2469 - 5 - LRB104 08825 RLC 18880 b