Senate | 04/11/2025 | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Javier L. Cervantes | ||
Senate | 04/11/2025 | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Karina Villa | ||
Senate | 04/10/2025 | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Graciela Guzmán | ||
Senate | 04/08/2025 | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Adriane Johnson | ||
Senate | 03/24/2025 | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Mary Edly-Allen | ||
Senate | 03/12/2025 | Referred to Assignments | ||
Senate | 03/12/2025 | First Reading | ||
Senate | 03/12/2025 | Filed with Secretary by Sen. Willie Preston |