Senate | 05/06/2025 | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Laura Fine | ||
Senate | 05/01/2025 | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Graciela Guzmán | ||
Senate | 05/01/2025 | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Mattie Hunter | ||
Senate | 04/30/2025 | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Sara Feigenholtz | ||
Senate | 04/25/2025 | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. David Koehler | ||
Senate | 04/24/2025 | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Mike Porfirio | ||
Senate | 04/22/2025 | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Karina Villa | ||
Senate | 04/11/2025 | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Cristina Castro | ||
Senate | 04/03/2025 | Referred to Assignments | ||
Senate | 04/03/2025 | First Reading | ||
Senate | 04/03/2025 | Filed with Secretary by Sen. Ram Villivalam |