LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
Illinois IL
Legislatures
2025-2026 Regular Session
Senate
Bills
SJR0016
Action History
IL
Illinois Senate Bill SJR0016
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
Illinois 2025-2026 Regular Session
Illinois Senate Bill SJR0016
Action History
Senate
05/08/2025
Placed on Calendar Order of Secretary's Desk Resolutions May 13, 2025
Senate
05/08/2025
Be Adopted Commerce; 007-000-000
Senate
05/07/2025
Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Craig Wilcox
Senate
03/18/2025
Assigned to Commerce
Senate
01/31/2025
Referred to Assignments
Senate
01/31/2025
Filed with Secretary