Senate | 05/07/2025 | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Meg Loughran Cappel | ||
Senate | 05/06/2025 | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Patrick J. Joyce | ||
Senate | 05/06/2025 | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Mark L. Walker | ||
Senate | 05/06/2025 | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Christopher Belt | ||
Senate | 05/06/2025 | Assigned to Commerce | ||
Senate | 05/06/2025 | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Terri Bryant | ||
Senate | 05/02/2025 | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Laura M. Murphy | ||
Senate | 05/02/2025 | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Andrew S. Chesney | ||
Senate | 05/01/2025 | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Julie A. Morrison | ||
Senate | 05/01/2025 | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Chris Balkema | ||
Senate | 05/01/2025 | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Bill Cunningham | ||
Senate | 05/01/2025 | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Michael W. Halpin | ||
Senate | 04/30/2025 | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Paul Faraci | ||
Senate | 04/30/2025 | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Jason Plummer | ||
Senate | 04/30/2025 | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Laura Ellman | ||
Senate | 04/30/2025 | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Jil Tracy | ||
Senate | 04/30/2025 | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Craig Wilcox | ||
Senate | 04/23/2025 | Referred to Assignments | ||
Senate | 04/23/2025 | Filed with Secretary |