House | 05/15/2025 | Placed on Calendar Order of Resolutions | ||
House | 05/15/2025 | Recommends Be Adopted Education Policy Committee; 012-000-000 | ||
House | 05/14/2025 | Motion to Suspend Rule 21 - Prevailed by Voice Vote | ||
House | 05/14/2025 | Motion Filed to Suspend Rule 21 Education Policy Committee; Rep. Elizabeth "Lisa" Hernandez | ||
House | 05/14/2025 | Assigned to Education Policy Committee | ||
House | 05/09/2025 | Referred to Rules Committee | ||
House | 05/08/2025 | Chief House Sponsor Rep. Paul Jacobs | ||
House | 05/08/2025 | Arrived in House | ||
Senate | 05/08/2025 | Resolution Adopted; 055-000-000 | ||
Senate | 05/08/2025 | 3/5 Vote Required | ||
Senate | 05/07/2025 | Placed on Calendar Order of Secretary's Desk Resolutions May 8, 2025 | ||
Senate | 05/07/2025 | Be Adopted Education; 014-000-000 | ||
Senate | 04/30/2025 | Assigned to Education | ||
Senate | 04/29/2025 | Referred to Assignments | ||
Senate | 04/29/2025 | Filed with Secretary |