Senate | 05/08/2025 | Resolution Adopted | ||
Senate | 03/19/2025 | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Don Harmon | ||
Senate | 02/11/2025 | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Dave Syverson | ||
Senate | 02/05/2025 | Placed on Calendar Order of Secretary's Desk Resolutions February 18, 2025 | ||
Senate | 02/05/2025 | Be Adopted Public Health; 008-000-000 | ||
Senate | 02/04/2025 | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Javier L. Cervantes | ||
Senate | 01/28/2025 | Assigned to Public Health | ||
Senate | 01/22/2025 | Referred to Assignments | ||
Senate | 01/22/2025 | Filed with Secretary |