Illinois 2025-2026 Regular Session

Illinois Senate Bill SR0034 Latest Draft

Bill / Introduced Version Filed 01/24/2025

                            SR0034LRB104 08211 ECR 18261 r   SR0034  LRB104 08211 ECR 18261 r
  SR0034  LRB104 08211 ECR 18261 r
1  SENATE RESOLUTION
2  WHEREAS, The members of the Illinois Senate are saddened
3  to learn of the death of Gerald R. "Jerry" Block of Danville,
4  who passed away on January 3, 2025; and
5  WHEREAS, Jerry Block, the son of Raymond and Camille
6  (Trotter) Block, was born in Sidney on June 17, 1938; he
7  graduated from Danville High School in 1956; he served in the
8  U.S. Army; he was formerly married to Judy Laird, and they were
9  married on March 25, 1966; and
10  WHEREAS, Jerry Block worked for Bohn Aluminum, where he
11  was elected as president of the local UAW union in May 1958;
12  and
13  WHEREAS, Jerry Block was elected Vermilion County Circuit
14  Clerk in 1964, serving a total of 28 years until 1992; he then
15  served on the Vermilion County Board from 1992, retiring in
16  2000; during his tenure, he served on the Board of Review from
17  1994 to 1998, where he was chairman from 1997 to 1998; he was
18  appointed and served as a trustee of the Danville Sanitary
19  District Board from 2001 to 2013; he was later appointed as a
20  trustee of the Danville Township, serving in that position
21  from 2017 to 2021, and he was elected to a four-year term in
22  April 2021; at the time of his passing, he was serving as a

 

  SR0034  LRB104 08211 ECR 18261 r


SR0034- 2 -LRB104 08211 ECR 18261 r   SR0034 - 2 - LRB104 08211 ECR 18261 r
  SR0034 - 2 - LRB104 08211 ECR 18261 r
1  trustee on the Danville Township Board; overall, he served in
2  an elected office or an appointment for a total of 44 years;
3  and
4  WHEREAS, Jerry Block was a member of the Landmark Credit
5  Union Board, and he was active with the Vermilion County
6  Democratic Association; and
7  WHEREAS, Jerry Block enjoyed golfing, bowling, watching
8  NASCAR, singing karaoke, attending cookouts, supporting the
9  Democratic Party, and spending time with family and friends;
10  and
11  WHEREAS, Jerry Block was preceded in death by his parents;
12  his sisters, Marilyn Jones and Karen Martin; and his brother,
13  Richard "Whitey" Block; and
14  WHEREAS, Jerry Block is survived by his daughter, Leisa
15  (Tom) Nimrick; four grandchildren; three great-grandchildren;
16  his brothers, Kenneth Block and James (Nan Mettam) Block; his
17  sisters, Debby (William) Townsley and Beth Carrigan; his half
18  brothers, Chris Block and Brett Block; his half sister, Tammy
19  Sexton; his longtime companion, Brenda Demos, and her family;
20  and several nieces, nephews, great-nieces, great-nephews, and
21  special friends; therefore, be it

 

 

  SR0034 - 2 - LRB104 08211 ECR 18261 r


SR0034- 3 -LRB104 08211 ECR 18261 r   SR0034 - 3 - LRB104 08211 ECR 18261 r
  SR0034 - 3 - LRB104 08211 ECR 18261 r
1  RESOLVED, BY THE SENATE OF THE ONE HUNDRED FOURTH GENERAL
2  ASSEMBLY OF THE STATE OF ILLINOIS, that we mourn the passing of
3  Gerald R. "Jerry" Block and extend our sincere condolences to
4  his family, friends, and all who knew and loved him; and be it
5  further

 

 

  SR0034 - 3 - LRB104 08211 ECR 18261 r