Senate | 05/07/2025 | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Mike Simmons | ||
Senate | 03/05/2025 | Resolution Adopted | ||
Senate | 02/19/2025 | Placed on Calendar Order of Secretary's Desk Resolutions February 20, 2025 | ||
Senate | 02/19/2025 | Be Adopted Education; 012-000-000 | ||
Senate | 02/11/2025 | Assigned to Education | ||
Senate | 01/28/2025 | Referred to Assignments | ||
Senate | 01/28/2025 | Filed with Secretary |