Illinois 2025-2026 Regular Session

Illinois Senate Bill SR0137 Latest Draft

Bill / Introduced Version Filed 02/27/2025

                            SR0137LRB104 12557 MST 23046 r   SR0137  LRB104 12557 MST 23046 r
  SR0137  LRB104 12557 MST 23046 r
1  SENATE RESOLUTION
2  WHEREAS, The members of the Illinois Senate are saddened
3  to learn of the death of Walter Junior "Walt" Davis of East
4  Peoria, who passed away on December 29, 2024; and
5  WHEREAS, Walt Davis was born in St. Louis, Missouri to
6  Willard W. and Katherine L. (Farmer) Davis on October 9, 1936;
7  he was a veteran of the United States Army and served with the
8  Illinois Army National Guard; he married Beverly K. Young on
9  March 9, 1958; he later married Sally L. Schwab in Peoria on
10  October 20, 1984; and
11  WHEREAS, Walt Davis worked for Caterpillar for 37 years,
12  retiring in 1990 from the general offices in Peoria as a
13  manager in the Challenger 65 Division; and
14  WHEREAS, Walt Davis had a passion for waterfowl hunting;
15  he enjoyed fishing at Spring Lake and at Bennett Springs,
16  Missouri; he also enjoyed fly fishing; he was a member of the
17  Pekin Chapter of Ducks Unlimited, the Tazewell County Gun Club
18  for more than 40 years, and Grace United Methodist Church in
19  Pekin; and
20  WHEREAS, Walt Davis was preceded in death by his parents;
21  his infant daughter, Jeanine Davis; his brothers, William

 

  SR0137  LRB104 12557 MST 23046 r


SR0137- 2 -LRB104 12557 MST 23046 r   SR0137 - 2 - LRB104 12557 MST 23046 r
  SR0137 - 2 - LRB104 12557 MST 23046 r
1  Davis and Duane John Davis; and his sister, Daphne Sweeney;
2  and
3  WHEREAS, Walt Davis is survived by his wife, Sally; his
4  daughter, Lori Ann McCullough; his sons, Scott Michael Davis
5  and Mark Wayne (Michelle) Davis; his stepsons, Keith Allan
6  (Sue Ellen) Phelps, Bradley Wayne (Melissa) Phelps, and Morgan
7  Richard (Pamela) Phelps; his grandchildren, Joshua (Kassi)
8  Neltner, Tara (Joe) Cook, Zach (Casey) Davis, and Ashley
9  (Jacob) Greco; seven step-grandchildren; six
10  great-grandchildren; four step-great-grandchildren; and one
11  sister, Shirley (Bob) Hays; therefore, be it
12  RESOLVED, BY THE SENATE OF THE ONE HUNDRED FOURTH GENERAL
13  ASSEMBLY OF THE STATE OF ILLINOIS, that we mourn the passing of
14  Walter Junior "Walt" Davis and extend our sincere condolences
15  to his family, friends, and all who knew and loved him; and be
16  it further
17  RESOLVED, That a suitable copy of this resolution be
18  presented to the family of Walt Davis as an expression of our
19  deepest sympathy.

 

 

  SR0137 - 2 - LRB104 12557 MST 23046 r