Illinois 2025-2026 Regular Session

Illinois Senate Bill SR0140 Latest Draft

Bill / Introduced Version Filed 03/04/2025

                            SR0140LRB104 12589 LAW 23170 r   SR0140  LRB104 12589 LAW 23170 r
  SR0140  LRB104 12589 LAW 23170 r
1  SENATE RESOLUTION
2  WHEREAS, The members of the Illinois Senate are saddened
3  to learn of the death of Earlona Mae Looby of Springfield, who
4  passed away on February 19, 2025; and
5  WHEREAS, Earlona Looby, the daughter of J. Earle and Leona
6  (Brown) Williams, was born in Springfield on April 24, 1933;
7  she graduated from Sacred Heart Academy in 1951; she married
8  Vincent L. "Vince" Looby in Springfield on June 23, 1956, and
9  he preceded her in death on August 5, 2021; she earned her
10  bachelor's degree from Sangamon State University, known today
11  as the University of Illinois Springfield, in 1984; and
12  WHEREAS, Earlona Looby served as a social worker for the
13  Illinois Youth Service Bureau; and
14  WHEREAS, Earlona Looby was a member of St. Agnes Catholic
15  Church and the Altrusa Club; she volunteered for numerous
16  community services, and the Senior Center of the Senior
17  Services of Central Illinois was very important to her; and
18  WHEREAS, Earlona Looby was preceded in death by her
19  parents and her sisters, Joan Bishop and Cathe Lewis; and
20  WHEREAS, Earlona Looby is survived by her children, Jim

 

  SR0140  LRB104 12589 LAW 23170 r


SR0140- 2 -LRB104 12589 LAW 23170 r   SR0140 - 2 - LRB104 12589 LAW 23170 r
  SR0140 - 2 - LRB104 12589 LAW 23170 r
1  (Melinda) Looby, William Looby, David Looby, Ann Young, Lynn
2  Marguerite, and Amy Looby; 12 grandchildren; five
3  great-grandchildren; and her sister, Annette Nelson;
4  therefore, be it
5  RESOLVED, BY THE SENATE OF THE ONE HUNDRED FOURTH GENERAL
6  ASSEMBLY OF THE STATE OF ILLINOIS, that we mourn the passing of
7  Earlona Mae Looby and extend our sincere condolences to her
8  family, friends, and all who knew and loved her; and be it
9  further
10  RESOLVED, That a suitable copy of this resolution be
11  presented to the family of Earlona Looby as an expression of
12  our deepest sympathy.

 

 

  SR0140 - 2 - LRB104 12589 LAW 23170 r