Senate | 04/11/2025 | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Li Arellano, Jr. | ||
Senate | 04/11/2025 | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Chris Balkema | ||
Senate | 04/11/2025 | Resolution Adopted | ||
Senate | 04/11/2025 | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Craig Wilcox | ||
Senate | 04/08/2025 | Placed on Calendar Order of Secretary's Desk Resolutions April 9, 2025 | ||
Senate | 04/08/2025 | Approved for Consideration Assignments | ||
Senate | 04/01/2025 | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Robert F. Martwick | ||
Senate | 03/20/2025 | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. David Koehler | ||
Senate | 03/20/2025 | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Julie A. Morrison | ||
Senate | 03/12/2025 | Referred to Assignments | ||
Senate | 03/12/2025 | Filed with Secretary |