House
|
03/08/2022
|
Public Law 45
|
|
|
House
|
03/08/2022
|
Signed by the Governor
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/08/2022
|
Signed by the President of the Senate
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/07/2022
|
Signed by the President Pro Tempore
|
|
|
House
|
03/04/2022
|
Signed by the Speaker
|
|
|
House
|
03/01/2022
|
House concurred in Senate amendments; Roll Call 305: yeas 94, nays 2
|
|
|
House
|
02/28/2022
|
Motion to concur filed
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/23/2022
|
Returned to the House with amendments
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/22/2022
|
Senator Charbonneau added as cosponsor
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/22/2022
|
Third reading: passed; Roll Call 228: yeas 46, nays 3
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/21/2022
|
Amendment #4 (Pol) failed; voice vote
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/21/2022
|
Amendment #2 (Pol) failed; Roll Call 212: yeas 10, nays 36
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/21/2022
|
Second reading: ordered engrossed
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/17/2022
|
Senator Ford Jon added as cosponsor
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/17/2022
|
Committee report: do pass, adopted
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/10/2022
|
Committee report: amend do pass adopted; reassigned to Committee on Appropriations
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/01/2022
|
First reading: referred to Committee on Corrections and Criminal Law
|
|
|
House
|
01/12/2022
|
Referred to the Senate
|
|
|
House
|
01/11/2022
|
Representatives Lehman, May, Negele, Heaton, Teshka J, Speedy, Schaibley, Clere, Ziemke, Gutwein, Abbott D, Miller, O'Brien T, Leonard, Cook, Karickhoff, Young J, Rowray E, Manning, Lindauer, Snow C, Goodrich, Mayfield, Judy, Bartels, VanNatter, Heine, Saunders, Gore M added as coauthors
|
|
|
House
|
01/11/2022
|
Representatives Pressel and Cherry added as coauthors
|
|
|
House
|
01/11/2022
|
Rule 105.2 suspended
|
|
|
House
|
01/11/2022
|
Senate sponsors: Senators Koch and Freeman
|
|
|
House
|
01/11/2022
|
Third reading: passed; Roll Call 7: yeas 90, nays 3
|
|
|
House
|
01/06/2022
|
Committee report: amend do pass, adopted
|
|
|
House
|
01/04/2022
|
First reading: referred to Committee on Courts and Criminal Code
|
|
|
House
|
01/04/2022
|
Coauthored by Representatives McNamara and Steuerwald
|
|
|
House
|
01/04/2022
|
Authored by Representative Frye R
|
|
|