House
|
03/08/2022
|
Public Law 47
|
|
|
House
|
03/08/2022
|
Signed by the Governor
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/08/2022
|
Signed by the President of the Senate
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/07/2022
|
Signed by the President Pro Tempore
|
|
|
House
|
03/04/2022
|
Signed by the Speaker
|
|
|
House
|
03/01/2022
|
House concurred in Senate amendments; Roll Call 307: yeas 92, nays 0
|
|
|
House
|
02/28/2022
|
Motion to concur filed
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/23/2022
|
Returned to the House with amendments
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/22/2022
|
Senator Baldwin added as cosponsor
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/22/2022
|
Third reading: passed; Roll Call 230: yeas 49, nays 0
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/21/2022
|
Senator Crane added as cosponsor
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/21/2022
|
Second reading: ordered engrossed
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/15/2022
|
Committee report: amend do pass, adopted
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/07/2022
|
Senator Boehnlein added as cosponsor
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/07/2022
|
Senator Koch added as second sponsor
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/01/2022
|
First reading: referred to Committee on Tax and Fiscal Policy
|
|
|
House
|
01/19/2022
|
Referred to the Senate
|
|
|
House
|
01/18/2022
|
Representatives Snow C, Smaltz, Carbaugh, Klinker added as coauthors
|
|
|
House
|
01/18/2022
|
Rule 105.2 suspended
|
|
|
House
|
01/18/2022
|
Senate sponsor: Senator Holdman
|
|
|
House
|
01/18/2022
|
Third reading: passed; Roll Call 21: yeas 91, nays 0
|
|
|
House
|
01/13/2022
|
Amendment #2 (Porter) ruled out of order
|
|
|
House
|
01/13/2022
|
Amendment #1 (Porter) ruled out of order
|
|
|
House
|
01/04/2022
|
First reading: referred to Committee on Ways and Means
|
|
|
House
|
01/04/2022
|
Authored by Representative Heine
|
|
|