Senate | 02/01/2022 | First reading: referred to Committee on Veterans Affairs and The Military | ||
House | 01/19/2022 | Referred to the Senate | ||
House | 01/18/2022 | Senate sponsors: Senators Garten and Messmer | ||
House | 01/18/2022 | Third reading: passed; Roll Call 20: yeas 89, nays 2 | ||
House | 01/13/2022 | Representative Moseley added as coauthor | ||
House | 01/13/2022 | Representative Pack R added as coauthor | ||
House | 01/13/2022 | Second reading: ordered engrossed | ||
House | 01/11/2022 | Representative May added as coauthor | ||
House | 01/11/2022 | Committee report: amend do pass, adopted | ||
House | 01/04/2022 | First reading: referred to Committee on Veterans Affairs and Public Safety | ||
House | 01/04/2022 | Authored by Representative Bartels |