Senate
|
02/24/2022
|
Pursuant to Senate Rule 68(b); reassigned to Committee on Rules and Legislative Procedure
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/22/2022
|
Senator Kruse added as cosponsor
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/17/2022
|
Senators Garten and Young M added as cosponsors
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/17/2022
|
Senator Crane added as cosponsor
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/17/2022
|
Senator Byrne added as cosponsor
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/07/2022
|
First reading: referred to Committee on Judiciary
|
|
|
House
|
01/12/2022
|
Referred to the Senate
|
|
|
House
|
01/11/2022
|
Representative Borders added as coauthor
|
|
|
House
|
01/11/2022
|
Representatives Carbaugh, Lindauer, Engleman, Gutwein, Wesco, Teshka J, May, Behning, Heaton, Frye, Mayfield, Hostettler, Jeter C, Judy, Abbott D, Lauer, Barrett, Leonard, Cook, Davis M, Ledbetter C, VanNatter, Heine, Manning, Davisson J., Payne Z added as coauthors
|
|
|
House
|
01/11/2022
|
Cosponsor: Senator Messmer
|
|
|
House
|
01/11/2022
|
Representative Snow C added as coauthor
|
|
|
House
|
01/11/2022
|
Rule 105.2 suspended
|
|
|
House
|
01/11/2022
|
Senate sponsors: Senators Koch, Tomes, Houchin
|
|
|
House
|
01/11/2022
|
Third reading: passed; Roll Call 8: yeas 64, nays 29
|
|
|
House
|
01/10/2022
|
Appeal the ruling of the chair (Gore); ruling of the chair sustained. Roll Call 5: yeas 66, nays 24
|
|
|
House
|
01/10/2022
|
Representative Lucas added as coauthor
|
|
|
House
|
01/10/2022
|
Amendment #1 (Andrade) ruled out of order
|
|
|
House
|
01/10/2022
|
Amendment #2 (Gore) ruled out of order
|
|
|
House
|
01/10/2022
|
Amendment #3 (Clere) prevailed; voice vote
|
|
|
House
|
01/10/2022
|
Second reading: amended, ordered engrossed
|
|
|
House
|
01/06/2022
|
Committee report: do pass, adopted
|
|
|
House
|
01/04/2022
|
First reading: referred to Committee on Public Policy
|
|
|
House
|
01/04/2022
|
Coauthored by Representative Lehman
|
|
|
House
|
01/04/2022
|
Authored by Representative Smaltz
|
|
|