Senate | 02/01/2022 | First reading: referred to Committee on Corrections and Criminal Law | ||
House | 01/25/2022 | Referred to the Senate | ||
House | 01/24/2022 | Senate sponsor: Senator Crider | ||
House | 01/24/2022 | Third reading: passed; Roll Call 57: yeas 94, nays 0 | ||
House | 01/18/2022 | Second reading: ordered engrossed | ||
House | 01/13/2022 | Committee report: amend do pass, adopted | ||
House | 01/12/2022 | Representative Olthoff added as coauthor | ||
House | 01/11/2022 | Representative Bartlett added as coauthor | ||
House | 01/04/2022 | First reading: referred to Committee on Courts and Criminal Code | ||
House | 01/04/2022 | Coauthored by Representative Negele | ||
House | 01/04/2022 | Authored by Representative McNamara |