House
|
03/15/2022
|
Public Law 139
|
|
|
House
|
03/15/2022
|
Signed by the Governor
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/15/2022
|
Signed by the President of the Senate
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/09/2022
|
Signed by the President Pro Tempore
|
|
|
House
|
03/09/2022
|
Signed by the Speaker
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/08/2022
|
Rules Suspended. Conference Committee Report 1: adopted by the Senate; Roll Call 359: yeas 45, nays 5
|
|
|
House
|
03/08/2022
|
Rules Suspended. Conference Committee Report 1: adopted by the House; Roll Call 364: yeas 94, nays 2
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/08/2022
|
CCR # 1 filed in the Senate
|
|
|
House
|
03/08/2022
|
CCR # 1 filed in the House
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/07/2022
|
Senator Buchanan added as conferee
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/07/2022
|
Senator Yoder removed as conferee
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/07/2022
|
Senator Buchanan removed as advisor
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/02/2022
|
Senate advisors appointed: Buchanan and Ford J.D.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/02/2022
|
Senate conferees appointed: Raatz and Yoder
|
|
|
House
|
03/02/2022
|
House advisors appointed: Davis and Pfaff
|
|
|
House
|
03/02/2022
|
House conferees appointed: Behning and Klinker
|
|
|
House
|
03/02/2022
|
House dissented from Senate amendments
|
|
|
House
|
03/02/2022
|
Motion to dissent filed
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/02/2022
|
Returned to the House with amendments
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/01/2022
|
Third reading: passed; Roll Call 283: yeas 50, nays 0
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/28/2022
|
Amendment #1 (Raatz) prevailed; voice vote
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/28/2022
|
Second reading: amended, ordered engrossed
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/24/2022
|
Committee report: amend do pass, adopted
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/17/2022
|
Committee report: amend do pass adopted; reassigned to Committee on Appropriations
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/02/2022
|
First reading: referred to Committee on Education and Career Development
|
|
|
House
|
01/19/2022
|
Referred to the Senate
|
|
|
House
|
01/18/2022
|
Senate sponsors: Senators Raatz and Buchanan
|
|
|
House
|
01/18/2022
|
Third reading: passed; Roll Call 19: yeas 91, nays 0
|
|
|
House
|
01/13/2022
|
Representative Klinker added as coauthor
|
|
|
House
|
01/13/2022
|
Representatives Davis M and Pfaff added as coauthors
|
|
|
House
|
01/13/2022
|
Amendment #1 (Behning) prevailed; voice vote
|
|
|
House
|
01/04/2022
|
First reading: referred to Committee on Education
|
|
|
House
|
01/04/2022
|
Authored by Representative Behning
|
|
|