House | 01/27/2022 | Amendment #1 (Austin) motion withdrawn | ||
House | 01/27/2022 | Amendment #2 (Austin) failed; Roll Call 129: yeas 30, nays 64 | ||
House | 01/27/2022 | Amendment #9 (Steuerwald) prevailed; voice vote | ||
House | 01/27/2022 | Second reading: amended, ordered engrossed | ||
House | 01/25/2022 | Representative Hatcher added as coauthor | ||
House | 01/20/2022 | Committee report: do pass, adopted | ||
House | 01/11/2022 | Representative Lehman added as coauthor | ||
House | 01/04/2022 | First reading: referred to Committee on Commerce, Small Business and Economic Development | ||
House | 01/04/2022 | Coauthored by Representative Steuerwald | ||
House | 01/04/2022 | Authored by Representative Soliday |